Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Cach Llc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Bryan Manno, Esq, against Grant, Judith M, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with JAGGER, EDWIN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2007 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedSeptember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF COUNSEL
Date: December 20, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF COUNSEL
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
August 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF GARNISHEE
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
July 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF WRIT OF GARNISHMENT
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
July 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
ANSWER OF GARNISHEE BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPANY
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
July 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
July 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE PURSUANT TO FS 77.041 AND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
June 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
June 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
MOTION-REQUEST FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT /BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPANY
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
June 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
December 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
REOPEN - CLOSED
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.