Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Cach Llc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Melissa A Ferris, against Scott, Donald, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with JAGGER, EDWIN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2007 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedFebruary 05, 2022 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Recording Of Satisfaction - Fee Paid $ Comment: RECORDING OF SATISFACTION - FEE PAID $10.00; VER: N; P
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
May 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT Comment: SATISFACTION OF JUDGEMENT OR17589PG0562-001; VER: R; P Vol./Book 17589, Page 0562, 001 pages
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
February 10, 2009 | Docket Event |
AS TO: Comment: TO: CACH LLC C/O MELISSA A FERRIS PA; VER: N; A
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
February 10, 2009 | Docket Event |
AS TO: Comment: FOR: GARN ATTY FEES/FO 012709 CACH LLC V SCOTT; VER: N; A
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
February 10, 2009 | Docket Event |
TEXT Comment: COURT REGISTRY CHECK NUMBER: 833684 $100.00; VER: N; A
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
February 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
CC CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT Comment: C/C CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT RETD (NO SERVICE ATTD); VER: F; K
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
January 27, 2009 | Docket Event |
ORDER Comment: FINAL ORDER ON CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; VER: F; P
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
January 27, 2009 | Docket Event |
RECORDED AT Comment: RECORDED AT: OR16486PG0724-002; VER: N; P Vol./Book 16486, Page 0724, 002 pages
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
December 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE Comment: NOTICE OF GARNISHMENT; VER: F; P
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
December 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
ANSWER OF GARNISHEE Comment: ANSWER OF GARNISHEE PINELLAS SUNCOAST TRANSIT AUTHORITY; VER: F; G
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.