Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Andrew D Fleisher, against Griffin, Katrina, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with CARASSAS, JOHN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2007 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedOctober 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
WRIT OF GARNISHMENT RETD SERVED 061615
Date: June 18, 2015WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED 6/10/15
Date: June 05, 2015PLAINTIFF'S MOTION-REQUEST FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT REGIONS BANK NA
Date: June 05, 2015NOTICE OF GARNISHMENT AND OFFER TO SETTLE
Date: June 18, 2015PLTF-PET'S MOTION TO STRIKE THE DEFENDANT'S CLAIM OF EXEMPTION
Date: June 29, 2015(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF GARNISHMENT
Date: July 23, 2015ORDER TO RECLOSE NO ACTIVITY Doc # 1
Date: September 02, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO RECLOSE NO ACTIVITY Doc # 1
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
MOTION (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer CARASSAS, JOHN)
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
September 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
July 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF GARNISHMENT
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
June 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
OBJECTION AFFIDANT IN OPPOSITION TO CLAIM OF EXEMPTION AND IN SUPPORT OF MOTN TO STRIKE CLAIM
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
June 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION TO STRIKE THE DEFENDANT'S CLAIM OF EXEMPTION
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
June 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
CASE REOPENED
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
June 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
ANSWER OF GARNISHEE REGIONS BANK
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
June 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF GARNISHMENT RETD SERVED 061615
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
June 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF GARNISHMENT AND OFFER TO SETTLE
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.