Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with George M. Jirotka presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2006 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 06, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF PLAINTIFF
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
October 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE REDIRECT SUPPORT FROM DOR
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
February 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
RESPONDENT'S QUESTIONNAIRE
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
February 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
FINDINGS-ORDER OF CONTEMPT
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
February 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
ARREARAGE AFFIDAVIT
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
February 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR CONTEMPT (1:30 PM) (Magistrate FLANNERY, JOSEPH) Motion for Contempt
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
February 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR CONTEMPT
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
February 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING 022613 AT 1:30
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
February 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
February 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
REOPEN CASE CIVIL CONTEMPT- ENFORCEMENT
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.