Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Flannigan, Timothy A, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Flannigan, Jessica, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with SERCUS, JULIE L presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 14, 2006 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS Doc # 11 Party: FLANNIGAN, TIMOTHY A
Judge: SERCUS, JULIE L |
|
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
REOPEN - CLOSED
Judge: SERCUS, JULIE L |
|
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER Doc # 10 RECLOSING CASE
Judge: SERCUS, JULIE L |
|
July 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
MOTION (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer SERCUS, JULIE L)
Judge: SERCUS, JULIE L |
|
August 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
RETURNED FROM POST OFFICE Doc # 9 ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE/NOTICE OF HEARING
Judge: SERCUS, JULIE L |
|
August 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Doc # 7 082219 9:00
Judge: SERCUS, JULIE L |
|
August 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF REFERENCE TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE Doc # 8
Judge: SERCUS, JULIE L |
|
April 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR COPIES Doc # 6 FROM TEXAS CSE
Judge: SERCUS, JULIE L |
|
February 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF REFERENCE TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE Doc # 4
Judge: SERCUS, JULIE L |
|
February 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE Doc # 5 TO MOTION FOR CONTEMPT
Judge: SERCUS, JULIE L |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.