Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Long, Louise, Florida State Ofdepartment Of Revenue, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case against Malnick, Randy, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with ALLAN, LINDA R presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 14, 2006 |
CategoryForeign Judgment Registration - Uifsa - Non Ivd |
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
REOPEN - CLOSED
Judge: ALLAN, LINDA R |
|
March 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
FINDINGS-ORDER OF COURT RE Comment: FINDINGS/ORDER OF COURT RE: WITHDRAWAL; VER: F; P
Judge: ALLAN, LINDA R |
|
March 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
RESPONDENT'S QUESTIONNAIRE Comment: RESPONDENTS QUESTIONNAIRE; VER: F; D
Judge: ALLAN, LINDA R |
|
March 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
DEPOSITORY NOTICE REMOVING DOR FROM CASE Comment: DOR LOCATION CHANGED TO NONE FROM NORTH BY 1166; VER: N; P
Judge: ALLAN, LINDA R |
|
March 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
DEPOSITORY NOTICE OF REDIRECTION OF SUPPORT Comment: DEPOSITORY NOTICE OF REDIRECTION OF SUPPORT; VER: F; P
Judge: ALLAN, LINDA R |
|
March 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
HEARING (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer ALLAN, LINDA R)
Judge: ALLAN, LINDA R |
|
March 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION Comment: CASE ASSIGNED SECTION 014 FROM SECTION HNO BY 1207 - RANDOM F A; VER: N; P
Judge: ALLAN, LINDA R |
|
February 16, 2007 | Docket Event |
CASE CALENDARED FOR Comment: CASE CALENDARED FOR PCL ON 030507 AT 09:30; VER: N; P
Judge: ALLAN, LINDA R |
|
January 25, 2007 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW Comment: MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS PARTY; VER: F; P
Judge: ALLAN, LINDA R |
|
January 25, 2007 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Comment: NOTICE OF HEARING 030507 @ 9:30; VER: F; P
Judge: ALLAN, LINDA R |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.