Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Lawrence, Yvonne, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Lawrence, Reuben B, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with ANDREWS, MICHAEL F presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 30, 2006 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 14, 2007 | Docket Event |
CERTIFIED STATEMENT COMPLETED BY CLERK Comment: CERTIFIED STATEMENT COMPLETED BY CLERK; VER: N; K
Judge: ANDREWS, MICHAEL F |
|
February 02, 2007 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P
Judge: ANDREWS, MICHAEL F |
|
February 02, 2007 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT Comment: FINAL JUDGMENT W/ALIMONY OR15617PG2057-016; VER: F; P Vol./Book 15617, Page 2057, 016 pages
Judge: ANDREWS, MICHAEL F |
|
February 02, 2007 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT (SRS) Comment: JUDGMENT; VER: N; P
Judge: ANDREWS, MICHAEL F |
|
January 25, 2007 | Docket Event |
PETITIONER'S FINANCIAL STATEMENT-AFFIDAVIT Comment: FINANCIAL STATEMENT/AFFIDAVIT; VER: F; P
Judge: ANDREWS, MICHAEL F |
|
January 25, 2007 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Comment: NOTICE OF HEARING 020207 AT 11:00; VER: F; P
Judge: ANDREWS, MICHAEL F |
|
January 16, 2007 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING Comment: NOTICE OF FILING; VER: F; P
Judge: ANDREWS, MICHAEL F |
|
January 16, 2007 | Docket Event |
MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT Comment: MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT; VER: F; P
Judge: ANDREWS, MICHAEL F |
|
January 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
CERT COMPLIANCE FL FAM RULE 12.285 - MAND DISCLOSURE Comment: CERT COMPLIANCE W/FLA FAM STAT 12.285; VER: F; P
Judge: ANDREWS, MICHAEL F |
|
January 02, 2007 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING Comment: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; VER: F; K
Judge: ANDREWS, MICHAEL F |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.