Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by David E Borack, against Hampshire, Tina L, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with ANDRINGA, HENRY J presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2006 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - County |
Last RefreshedJuly 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: July 08, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
June 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
Recording Of Judgment Lien - Fee Paid $ Comment: RECORDING OF JDMT LIEN - FEE PAID $10.00; VER: N; P
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
June 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
CC JUDGMENT MADE-HANDED RECORDING Comment: C/C JUDGEMENT MADE/HANDED RECORDING OR15835PG1599-001; VER: N; K Vol./Book 15835, Page 1599, 001 pages
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
June 07, 2007 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE FOR RECORDATION OF JDMT AS LIEN Comment: PRAECIPE FOR RECORDATION OF JDMT AS LIEN; VER: F; P
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
March 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT Comment: DEFAULT JUDGMENT OR15710PG2639-001; VER: F; P Vol./Book 15710, Page 2639, 001 pages
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
March 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO) Comment: DEFAULT JUDGMENT; VER: N; P
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
March 27, 2007 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED Comment: DEFAULT ENTERED; VER: N; K
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
March 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT Comment: AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF CLAIM AND; VER: N; P
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
March 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE Comment: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; VER: F; P
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
March 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES Comment: AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES; VER: F; P
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.