Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Provenzano, Helene, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Lablance, Steve, Lablance, Elizabeth, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with McNARY, MYRA SCOTT presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2006 |
CategoryDelinquent Tenant - County |
Last RefreshedJanuary 07, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2007 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION RETD EXECUTED; VER: F; K
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
January 16, 2007 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO SHERIFF; VER: N; K
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
January 12, 2007 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT Comment: FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION OR15585PG2124-001; VER: F; P Vol./Book 15585, Page 2124, 001 pages
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
January 12, 2007 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO) Comment: DEFAULT JUDGMENT; VER: N; P
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
January 12, 2007 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; K
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
January 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION RECEIVED Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION RECEIVED W/CHECK; VER: N; P
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
January 10, 2007 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED Comment: DEFAULT ENTERED COUNT I-STEVE LABLANCE/ELIZABETH LABLANCE; VER: N; K
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
January 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION Comment: MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JDMT-RESIDENTIAL EVICTION; VER: F; P
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
January 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE Comment: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; VER: F; P
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
January 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT Comment: MOTION FOR DEFAULT COUNT I BY CLERK; VER: F; P
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.