Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Pinecrest Ii Mobile Home Park Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Ernest A Kollra, against Smith Terry, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with FULLERTON, WALTER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2006 |
CategoryDelinquent Tenant - County |
Last RefreshedJanuary 08, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 12, 2007 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION RETD SERVED; VER: F; K
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
February 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION RECEIVED Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION RECEIVED W/CHECK; VER: N; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
February 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO SHERIFF; VER: N; K
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
February 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR Comment: REQUEST FOR: WRIT OF POSSESSION; VER: F; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
January 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION Comment: FINAL JUDGMENT - COUNT 1 POSSESSION OR15600PG0323-002; VER: F; P Vol./Book 15600, Page 0323, 002 pages
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
January 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT (SRS) Comment: JUDGMENT; VER: N; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
January 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT Comment: MOTION FOR DEFAULT; VER: F; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
January 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS Comment: AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS; VER: F; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
January 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE Comment: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; VER: F; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
January 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES Comment: AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES (2); VER: F; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.