Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Pinecrest Ii Mobile Home Park Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Ernest A Kollra, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with JAGGER, EDWIN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2006 |
CategoryDelinquent Tenant - County |
Last RefreshedJanuary 20, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
MASTER ORDER OF DISMISSAL Comment: MASTER ORDER (03-040) DISMISSAL CALENDAR AS FOLLOW:; VER: N; K
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
June 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; K
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
June 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
MASTER ORDER OF DISMISSAL Comment: POLDEN EDITH OR16303PG0709-004; VER: F; K Vol./Book 16303, Page 0709, 004 pages
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
March 12, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE INTENT DISM (LACK PROSECUTION) BY 000000 Comment: NOTICE INTENT DISM (LACK PROSECUTION) BY: 041408; VER: N; K
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
March 12, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE INTENT DISM (LACK PROSECUTION) BY 000000 Comment: POLDEN EDITH; VER: N; K
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
March 12, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISM MAILED TO PLTF(S) Comment: NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISM MAILED TO PLTF(S) (S)/PLTF(S) ATTY(S); VER: N; K
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
December 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-LACK OF PROS-DISM 000000-MLD AS TO Comment: NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED AS TO:; VER: N; K
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
December 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-LACK OF PROS-DISM 000000-MLD AS TO Comment: POLDEN EDITH; VER: N; K
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
January 16, 2007 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS SERVED - POSTED Comment: SUMMONS RETD SERVED/POSTED EDITH POLDEN 010207; VER: F; K
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
January 10, 2007 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING Comment: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; VER: F; K
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.