Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Palisades Collection Llc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Richard W Battaglino, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with McNARY, MYRA SCOTT presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 15, 2006 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - County |
Last RefreshedJanuary 14, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Comment: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/ PREJUDICE; VER: F; P
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
January 31, 2008 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT Comment: FINAL JUDGMENT OR16139PG0444-001; VER: F; P Vol./Book 16139, Page 0444, 001 pages
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
January 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT Comment: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-PAYMENT; VER: F; P
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
June 12, 2007 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL Comment: ORDER OF DISMISSAL OR15839PG2437-001; VER: F; P Vol./Book 15839, Page 2437, 001 pages
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
June 12, 2007 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; P
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
June 12, 2007 | Docket Event |
ORDER APPROVING Comment: ORDER APPROVING: STIPULATION AND; VER: N; P
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
June 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION Comment: STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT; VER: F; P
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
April 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING Comment: ORDER GRANTING TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AT HEARING; VER: F; P
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
April 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION Comment: MOTION TO PERMIT TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AT HEARING; VER: F; P
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
April 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Comment: NOTICE OF HEARING 051607 11:20; VER: F; P
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.