Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Morales-Mendez, Daniel, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Vazquez, Edgar Gomez, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with KHOUZAM, NELLY N presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 29, 2006 |
CategoryDomestic - Repeat Violence |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2022 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 25, 2007 | Docket Event |
CERTIFIED COPY Comment: CERTIFIED COPY ORDER DISMISSAL INJUNCTION RETD BY PO; VER: F; K
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
April 17, 2007 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT Comment: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF ORDER EXTENDING INJDISMISSED; VER: F; P
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
April 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; K
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
April 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF INJUNCTION Comment: ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF INJUNCTION OR15743PG1996-001; VER: F; P Vol./Book 15743, Page 1996, 001 pages
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
March 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT Comment: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF INJ REPLACED EXTENDED; VER: F; P
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
March 16, 2007 | Docket Event |
ORDER EXTENDING INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION Comment: ORDER EXTENDING INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION 041207 1:30; VER: F; P
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
January 30, 2007 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT Comment: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF ORDER EXTENDING EXTENDED; VER: F; P
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
January 25, 2007 | Docket Event |
ORDER EXTENDING INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION Comment: ORDER EXTENDING INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION 031507 @ 10; VER: F; P
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
December 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
CERTIFIED COPY Comment: C/C ORDER EXTENDING INJUNCTION RETD W/ORDER EXTENDING; VER: F; K
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
November 22, 2006 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT Comment: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF ORDER EXTENDING ETC EXTENDED; VER: F; P
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.