Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Destination Keys Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Daniel G Drake, against Moore, Cheryl, Gibbs, Raymond, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with FULLERTON, WALTER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 30, 2006 |
CategoryDelinquent Tenant - County |
Last RefreshedFebruary 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 18, 2006 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION RETD EXECUTED; VER: F; K
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
December 13, 2006 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO SHERIFF; VER: N; K
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
December 12, 2006 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO) Comment: DEFAULT JUDGMENT; VER: N; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
December 12, 2006 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION Comment: FINAL JUDGMENT - COUNT 1 POSSESSION OR15527PG2510-001; VER: F; P Vol./Book 15527, Page 2510, 001 pages
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
December 11, 2006 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED Comment: DEFAULT ENTERED COUNT I-RAYMOND GIBBS/CHERYL MOORE; VER: F; K
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
December 11, 2006 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION RECEIVED Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION RECEIVED W/CHECK; VER: N; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
December 08, 2006 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT Comment: AFFIDAVIT PROOF OF CLAIM AND; VER: N; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
December 08, 2006 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT Comment: MOTION FOR DEFAULT; VER: F; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
December 08, 2006 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE Comment: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; VER: F; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
December 08, 2006 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT Comment: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; VER: F; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.