Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Pasqualichio, Bernard, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Riffle, Charlene A, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with VACCARO, DOROTHY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVACCARO, DOROTHY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 29, 2006 |
CategoryDelinquent Tenant - County |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 28, 2006 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION RETD EXECUTED; VER: F; K
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
December 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION RECEIVED Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION RECEIVED W/O CHECK; VER: N; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
December 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED HANDED TO PS; VER: N; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
December 19, 2006 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT Comment: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT COUNT I; VER: F; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
December 19, 2006 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION Comment: FINAL JUDGMENT - COUNT 1 POSSESSION; VER: F; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
December 19, 2006 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; K
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
December 19, 2006 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO) Comment: DEFAULT JUDGMENT; VER: N; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
December 18, 2006 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED Comment: DEFAULT ENTERED BY COURT COUNT I; VER: N; K
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
December 15, 2006 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT Comment: MOTION FOR DEFAULT; VER: F; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
December 15, 2006 | Docket Event |
ORDER Comment: ORDER DEPOSIT FUNDS INTO COURT REGISTRY OR15542PG0190-001; VER: F; D Vol./Book 15542, Page 0190, 001 pages
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.