Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Arrow Financial Services, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by David E Borack, against Miskell, Christina, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with VACCARO, DOROTHY presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2006 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedJanuary 30, 2022 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 01, 2007 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
October 01, 2007 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Comment: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; VER: F; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
October 01, 2007 | Docket Event |
THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION Comment: CASE ASSIGNED SECTION 048 FROM SECTION NPC BY 8461 - MANUAL S; VER: N; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
August 29, 2007 | Docket Event |
NOTICE INTENT DISM (LACK PROSECUTION) BY 000000 A Comment: MISKELL CHRISTINA; VER: N; K
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
August 29, 2007 | Docket Event |
NOTICE INTENT DISM (LACK PROSECUTION) BY 000000 A Comment: NOTICE INTENT DISM (LACK PROSECUTION) BY: 100107 AS FOLLOWS:; VER: N; K
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
August 29, 2007 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISM MAILED TO PLTF(S) Comment: NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISM MAILED TO PLTF(S) (S)/PLTF(S) ATTY(S); VER: N; K
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
January 22, 2007 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME Comment: EX-PARTE ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME (120) DAYS; VER: F; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
January 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME Comment: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; VER: F; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
January 18, 2007 | Docket Event |
NO SERVICE LETTER MAILED Comment: NO SERVICE LETTER MAILED TO PLTF ATTY; VER: F; K
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
January 16, 2007 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO APPEAR - SERVED Comment: NOTICE RETURNED NOT SERVED; VER: F; K
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.