Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Asset Acceptance Llc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Jackie Wainio, against Raine, Linda W, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with ANDRINGA, HENRY J presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 14, 2006 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedJanuary 17, 2022 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 22, 2007 | Docket Event |
THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION Comment: CASE ASSIGNED SECTION 046 FROM SECTION SPC BY 8461 - MANUAL S; VER: N; P
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
October 22, 2007 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Comment: CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING; VER: N; P
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
October 22, 2007 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Comment: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/OUT PREJUDICE; VER: F; P
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
September 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISM MAILED TO PLTF(S) Comment: NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISM MAILED TO PLTF(S) (S)/PLTF(S) ATTY(S); VER: N; K
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
September 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
NOTICE INTENT DISM (LACK PROSECUTION) BY 000000 A Comment: NOTICE INTENT DISM (LACK PROSECUTION) BY: 102907 AS FOLLOWS:; VER: N; K
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
September 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
NOTICE INTENT DISM (LACK PROSECUTION) BY 000000 A Comment: RAINE LINDA W; VER: N; K
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
February 02, 2007 | Docket Event |
NO SERVICE LETTER MAILED Comment: NO SERVICE LETTER MAILED TO PLTF ATTY; VER: F; K
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
January 25, 2007 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO APPEAR - SERVED Comment: NOTICE RETURNED NOT SERVED; VER: F; K
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
December 15, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT Comment: NOTICE/STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT/ PS/HOFFMANS; VER: N; K
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
December 15, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY Comment: NOTICE TO PLTF ATTY/HRG 02/15 @2:00 J/ANDRINGA; VER: F; K
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.