Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Asset Acceptance Llc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Jackie Wainio, against Pankratz, Connie C, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with JAGGER, EDWIN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 14, 2006 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedJanuary 10, 2022 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
CC JUDGMENT MADE-HANDED RECORDING
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
December 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
REOPEN - CLOSED
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
November 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE Comment: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISSOLUTION; VER: F; P
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
June 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
TEXT Comment: COURT REGISTRY CHECK NUMBER: 802922 $100.00; VER: N; A
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
June 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
AS TO: Comment: TO: MIRO, RODOLFO ESQ; VER: N; A
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
June 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
AS TO: Comment: FOR: GARN ATTY FEES/FJ/ORD 061808 ASSET V PANKRATZ; VER: N; A
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
June 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT Comment: FINAL JUDGMENT IN GARNISHMENT/ OR16292PG0495-002; VER: F; P Vol./Book 16292, Page 0495, 002 pages
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
June 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
ORDER Comment: ORDER DIRECTING DISBURSING FUNDS/DEPOSIT; VER: F; P
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
June 13, 2008 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT Comment: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT GARNISHMENT/ORDER DISBURSE FUNDS; VER: F; P
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
May 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO DEF & INTERESTED PARTIES Comment: SECOND NOTICE TO DEF & INTERESTED PARTIES; VER: F; P
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.