Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Desiree M Andreau, against Profeta, Mary A, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with JAGGER, EDWIN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 30, 2006 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
NON RECORDED SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: May 25, 2016PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT OF GARNISHMENT AGAINST SALARY OR WAGES
Date: February 22, 2016NOTICE TO DEF & INTERESTED PARTIES AND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: September 23, 2015NOTICE TO DEF & INTERESTED PARTIES AND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: January 20, 2016ATTACHMENT
Date: September 24, 2015AFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ATTACHED
Date: September 24, 2015PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT JO ANN STORES - SENT TO JUDGE 9/14/15
Date: September 02, 2015AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS OF POST-JUDGMENT INTEREST & COSTS
Date: February 22, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
May 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
NON RECORDED SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
February 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE PROPOSED ORDER
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
February 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING FINAL JUDGMENT OF GARNISHMENT Vol./Book 19101, Page 1999, 2 pages
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
February 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT OF GARNISHMENT AGAINST SALARY OR WAGES
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
February 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS OF POST-JUDGMENT INTEREST & COSTS
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
February 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
CASE REOPENED
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
January 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO DEF & INTERESTED PARTIES AND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
September 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
ATTACHMENT
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
September 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ATTACHED
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.