Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Fedex Customer Information Services Inc Fcis, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Jennifer T Harley, against Unimed Surgical Products Inc, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with ANDRINGA, HENRY J presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 30, 2006 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedOctober 26, 2022 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 08, 2007 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION Comment: STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT; VER: F; P
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
February 08, 2007 | Docket Event |
ATTORNEY COVER LETTER Comment: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER; VER: F; P
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
February 08, 2007 | Docket Event |
ORDER APPROVING STIP FOR PAYMENT Comment: ORDER APPROVING STIP FOR PAYMENT; VER: F; P
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
January 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION Comment: CASE ASSIGNED SECTION 046 FROM SECTION SPC ICD; VER: N; P
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
January 25, 2007 | Docket Event |
SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL (10:30 AM) () Result: LEGACY MINUTES
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
January 25, 2007 | Docket Event |
TEXT Comment: - CLAIM, COST, INTEREST; VER: N; K
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
January 25, 2007 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT-JUDGMENT UPON RECEIPT OF Comment: DEFAULT-JUDGMENT UPON RECEIPT OF AFFDS IN PROOF OF; VER: N; K
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
January 10, 2007 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO APPEAR - SERVED Comment: NOTICE RETURNED SERVED; VER: F; K
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
December 01, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY Comment: NOTICE TO PLTF ATTY/HRG 01/25 @10:30 J/ANDRINGA; VER: F; K
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
December 01, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT Comment: NOTICE/STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT/ PS/NAC; VER: N; K
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.