Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Citifinancial Services Inc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Barnes, Cassandra N, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with ANDRINGA, HENRY J presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 30, 2006 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedJanuary 20, 2022 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 29, 2007 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS Comment: ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS; VER: F; P
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
January 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION Comment: CASE ASSIGNED SECTION 046 FROM SECTION SPC ICD; VER: N; P
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
January 25, 2007 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION-ORDER APPROVING PAYMENT Comment: STIPULATION/ORDER APPROVING PAYMENT 012907; VER: F; K
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
January 25, 2007 | Docket Event |
SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL (1:00 PM) () Result: LEGACY MINUTES
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
December 08, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO APPEAR - SERVED Comment: NOTICE RETURNED SERVED 120606; VER: F; K
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
December 01, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice To Plaintiff/Hrg Comment: NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF/HRG 01/25 @1:00 J/ANDRINGA; VER: F; K
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
December 01, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT Comment: NOTICE/STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT/ SHF; VER: N; K
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
November 30, 2006 | Docket Event |
THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION Comment: THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION SPC BY 1249 - RANDOM SC; VER: N; P
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
November 30, 2006 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Filing - Fee Paid Comment: SMALL CLAIMS FILING FEE PAID $155.00; VER: N; P
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
November 30, 2006 | Docket Event |
CASE FILED
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.