Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Wayne, Curtis, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Smith, Larry, Smith, Carrie, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with VACCARO, DOROTHY presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 29, 2006 |
CategoryDelinquent Tenant - County |
Last RefreshedOctober 27, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 20, 2006 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION RETD EXECUTED; VER: F; K
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
October 19, 2006 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING Comment: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; VER: F; K
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
October 18, 2006 | Docket Event |
DEF-RESP'S MOTION Comment: MOTION HAULT WRIT OF POSSESSION PRO SE; VER: F; D
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
October 18, 2006 | Docket Event |
ORDER DENYING Comment: ORDER DENYING MOTION STAY WRIT OF POSSESSION; VER: F; D
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
October 18, 2006 | Docket Event |
EMERGENCY MOTION Comment: EMERGENCY MOTION TO HALT WRIT OF POSSESSION/DENIED; VER: F; D
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
October 17, 2006 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO SHERIFF; VER: N; K
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
October 16, 2006 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO) Comment: DEFAULT JUDGMENT; VER: N; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
October 16, 2006 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; K
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
October 16, 2006 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT Comment: FINAL JUDGMENT FOR EVICTION OR15425PG0808-001; VER: F; P Vol./Book 15425, Page 0808, 001 pages
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
October 13, 2006 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED Comment: DEFAULT ENTERED COUNT I-LARRY SMITH; VER: N; K
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.