Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by David E Borack, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with RONDOLINO, ANTHONY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRONDOLINO, ANTHONY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2006 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
MASTER ORDER OF DISMISSAL Comment: WARREN DAVID W OR16996PG1163-003; VER: F; K Vol./Book 16996, Page 1163, 003 pages
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
August 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
MASTER ORDER OF DISMISSAL Comment: MASTER ORDER (05-013) DISMISSAL CALENDAR AS FOLLOW:; VER: N; K
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
August 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; K
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
May 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-LACK OF PROS-DISM 000000-MLD AS TO Comment: WARREN DAVID W; VER: N; K
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
May 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED TO ALL PARTIES Comment: NOTICE-LACK OF PROS MLD TO PLTF/PLTF ATTY; VER: N; K
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
May 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-LACK OF PROS-DISM 000000-MLD AS TO Comment: NOTICE-LACK OF PROS-DISM 071210-MLD AS TO:; VER: N; K
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
May 27, 2009 | Docket Event |
ORDER Comment: ORDER SHOWING GOOD CAUSE; VER: F; P
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
May 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE Comment: SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE; VER: F; P
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
May 06, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISM MAILED TO PLTF(S) Comment: NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISM MAILED TO PLTF(S) (S)/PLTF(S) ATTY(S); VER: N; K
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
May 06, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE INTENT DISM (LACK PROSECUTION) BY 000000 Comment: NOTICE INTENT DISM (LACK PROSECUTION) BY: 052609; VER: N; K
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.