Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Rupp, Stephanie, Rupp, Casey William, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Nikki M Kavouklis, against Usaa Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Evelio L Garcia, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with BAIRD, W presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 15, 2006 |
CategoryAuto Negligence - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 09, 2011 | Docket Event |
JOINT STIPULATION Comment: JOINT STIPULATION FOR ORDER OF DISMISSAL; VER: F; P
Judge: BAIRD, W DOUGLAS |
|
September 09, 2011 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Comment: CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING; VER: F; P
Judge: BAIRD, W DOUGLAS |
|
September 09, 2011 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL Comment: ORDER OF DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE OR17353PG1552-001; VER: F; P Vol./Book 17353, Page 1552, 001 pages
Judge: BAIRD, W DOUGLAS |
|
May 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
TEXT Comment: NOTICE FINAL DISPOSITION OF REFERRAL - SETTLED; VER: F; P
Judge: BAIRD, W DOUGLAS |
|
February 09, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE Comment: NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE 051311 9:00; VER: F; D
Judge: BAIRD, W DOUGLAS |
|
January 31, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE Comment: NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE 051311 9:00; VER: F; P
Judge: BAIRD, W DOUGLAS |
|
January 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION Comment: ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION; VER: F; P
Judge: BAIRD, W DOUGLAS |
|
January 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
DEF-RESP'S MOTION Comment: MOTION TO SET TRIAL; VER: F; D
Judge: BAIRD, W DOUGLAS |
|
June 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOT. OF SERV. OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT Comment: NOT. OF SERV. OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT; VER: F; D
Judge: BAIRD, W DOUGLAS |
|
March 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
REQUEST Comment: SECOND AMENDED REQUEST: FOR PHYSICAL EXAMINIATION; VER: F; D
Judge: BAIRD, W DOUGLAS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.