Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bickley Family Llp, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Heidi L Hobbs, against Ogg, Robert B, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with LOGAN, WALTER D presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 15, 2006 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
Recording Of Judgment Lien - Fee Paid $ Comment: RECORDING OF JDMT LIEN - FEE PAID $27.00; VER: N; P
Judge: LOGAN, WALTER D |
|
February 16, 2007 | Docket Event |
CC JUDGMENT MADE-HANDED RECORDING Comment: C/C JUDGEMENT MADE/HANDED RECORDING OR15643PG0523-003; VER: R; P Vol./Book 15643, Page 0523, 003 pages
Judge: LOGAN, WALTER D |
|
February 16, 2007 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE FOR RECORDATION OF JDMT AS LIEN Comment: PRAECIPE FOR RECORDATION OF JDMT AS LIEN; VER: F; P
Judge: LOGAN, WALTER D |
|
February 15, 2007 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR Comment: REQUEST FOR: C/C FINAL JUDGMENT AND RE-RECORD; VER: F; P
Judge: LOGAN, WALTER D |
|
February 07, 2007 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION RECEIVED Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION RECEIVED W/O CHECK; VER: N; P
Judge: LOGAN, WALTER D |
|
February 07, 2007 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED MLD TO ATTY; VER: N; K
Judge: LOGAN, WALTER D |
|
February 07, 2007 | Docket Event |
COPY CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE Comment: COPY CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE: MLD ORIG WRIT TO ATTY; VER: F; K
Judge: LOGAN, WALTER D |
|
February 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO) Comment: DEFAULT JUDGMENT; VER: N; P
Judge: LOGAN, WALTER D |
|
February 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
ATTORNEY COVER LETTER Comment: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER RECD BY COURT 020607; VER: F; P
Judge: LOGAN, WALTER D |
|
February 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT Comment: FINAL JUDGMENT OR15623PG0594-003; VER: F; P Vol./Book 15623, Page 0594, 003 pages
Judge: LOGAN, WALTER D |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.