Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Albrecht, Jeanne Dorothy, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Leichtling, Kenneth David, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with ST ARNOLD presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 31, 2006 |
CategoryDomestic Violence Injunction With Kids |
Last RefreshedDecember 26, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL Comment: ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF INJUNCTION OR16011PG0713-001; VER: F; P Vol./Book 16011, Page 0713, 001 pages
Judge: ST ARNOLD, JACK R |
|
September 19, 2006 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; P
Judge: ST ARNOLD, JACK R |
|
September 19, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Comment: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/O PREJUDICE; VER: F; P
Judge: ST ARNOLD, JACK R |
|
September 19, 2006 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; K
Judge: ST ARNOLD, JACK R |
|
September 15, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Comment: NOTICE OF HEARING NO DATE GIVEN; VER: F; P
Judge: ST ARNOLD, JACK R |
|
September 15, 2006 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF CONTINUANCE Comment: ORDER OF CONTINUANCE /RESCHEDULING RETURN; VER: N; P
Judge: ST ARNOLD, JACK R |
|
August 18, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE Comment: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS COUNSEL; VER: F; D
Judge: ST ARNOLD, JACK R |
|
August 11, 2006 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF CONTINUANCE Comment: ORDER OF CONTINUANCE /RESCHEDULING RETURN; VER: N; P
Judge: ST ARNOLD, JACK R |
|
August 11, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Comment: NOTICE OF HEARING 091406 AT 1:30; VER: F; P
Judge: ST ARNOLD, JACK R |
|
August 10, 2006 | Docket Event |
HEARING (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer ST ARNOLD, JACK R)
Judge: ST ARNOLD, JACK R |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.