Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Rymut, Darlene, Rymut, John, filed a(n) Declaratory - Circuit case represented by Brian P Battaglia, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with WILLIAMS, AMY M presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 14, 2006 |
CategoryDeclaratory - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Comment: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/ PREJUDICE; VER: F; P
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
May 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
ATTORNEY COVER LETTER Comment: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER RECD BY COURT 051608; VER: F; P
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
May 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT (SRS) Comment: JUDGMENT; VER: N; P
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
May 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT Comment: FINAL JUDGMENT OR16259PG2666-004; VER: F; P Vol./Book 16259, Page 2666, 004 pages
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
May 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING Comment: NOTICE OF FILING MEDIATION SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT; VER: F; P
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
May 15, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING Comment: NOTICE OF FILING; VER: F; P
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
May 15, 2008 | Docket Event |
MEDIATION SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT Comment: MEDIATION SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT; VER: F; P
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
April 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
APPEAL DISMISSED Comment: APPEAL DISMISSED; VER: F; D
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
April 15, 2008 | Docket Event |
TEXT Comment: NOTICE FINAL DISPOSITION OF REFERRAL SETTLED; VER: F; P
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
April 01, 2008 | Docket Event |
APPEAL CLERK'S WORKSHEET WITH ATTACHMENT Comment: APPEAL CLERK'S WORKSHEET W/ATTACHMENT; VER: F; K
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.