Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Stone, Ronald, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Marc B Nussbaum, Esq, against Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company, represented by Kristan S Coad, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with FULLERTON, WALTER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 29, 2006 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedNovember 26, 2022 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 14, 2007 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Comment: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; VER: F; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
May 14, 2007 | Docket Event |
THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION Comment: CASE ASSIGNED SECTION 045 FROM SECTION SPC BY 9345 - MANUAL S; VER: N; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
May 14, 2007 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
April 25, 2007 | Docket Event |
COPY Comment: COPY RESET SUMMONS RETD BY PO (RESENT DEF ATTY 4/25); VER: F; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
April 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
RESET NOTICE MAILED-EMAILED Comment: RESET NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES HRG 5/24 @ 1:00 J/FULLERTON; VER: F; K
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
April 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE Comment: CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE: STIP/SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL; VER: F; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
April 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
ORDER Comment: ORDER UPON STIPULATION FOR SUSTITUTION OF COUNSEL; VER: F; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
April 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION Comment: STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL; VER: F; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
March 22, 2007 | Docket Event |
TEXT Comment: 05/24/07 @ 1:00 PM SPC (WITHIN 60 DAYS); VER: N; K
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
March 22, 2007 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CONTINUED PRETRIAL RE Comment: NOTICE OF CONTINUED PRETRIAL RE: RESET PTC; VER: N; K
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.