Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Tarponaire Mobile Home Park Inc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Dorys H Penton, against Unknown, Parties, Seanor, William B, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with McNARY, MYRA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 31, 2006 |
CategoryDelinquent Tenant - County |
Last RefreshedDecember 25, 2020 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 08, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Comment: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/O PREJUDICE; VER: F; P
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
August 31, 2006 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO) Comment: DEFAULT JUDGMENT; VER: N; P
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
August 31, 2006 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT Comment: FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO COUNT I OR15342PG0250-002; VER: F; P Vol./Book 15342, Page 0250, 002 pages
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
August 29, 2006 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT Comment: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; VER: F; P
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
August 16, 2006 | Docket Event |
REPLY Comment: REPLY TO DEFTS ANSWER; VER: F; P
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
August 09, 2006 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING Comment: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; VER: F; K
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
August 09, 2006 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS - SERVED Comment: SUMMONS RETD SERVED WILLIAM B SEANOR 080206; VER: F; K
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
August 09, 2006 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS - SERVED Comment: SUMMONS RETD SERVED PARTIES UNKNOWN 080206; VER: F; K
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
August 08, 2006 | Docket Event |
ANSWER OF Comment: ANSWER OF: WILLIAM B SEANOR - PRO SE; VER: F; D
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
August 01, 2006 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING Comment: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; VER: F; K
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.