Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Vu, Thong K, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Cole, Virgil K, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with ANDRINGA, HENRY J presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 31, 2006 |
CategoryDelinquent Tenant - County |
Last RefreshedDecember 26, 2020 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 29, 2006 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION RETD EXECUTED; VER: F; K
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
August 24, 2006 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO SHERIFF; VER: N; K
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
August 23, 2006 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO) Comment: DEFAULT JUDGMENT; VER: N; P
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
August 23, 2006 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION Comment: FINAL JUDGMENT - COUNT 1 POSSESSION; VER: F; P
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
August 23, 2006 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; K
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
August 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED Comment: DEFAULT ENTERED COUNT I; VER: N; K
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
August 18, 2006 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT Comment: MOTION FOR DEFAULT COUNT I; VER: F; P
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
August 18, 2006 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION Comment: MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT COUNT I; VER: F; P
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
August 18, 2006 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE Comment: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; VER: F; P
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
August 18, 2006 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION RECEIVED Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION RECEIVED W/CHECK; VER: N; P
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.