Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Napoleon, Marisol, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Thompson, Adrienne, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with FULLERTON, WALTER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 31, 2006 |
CategoryDelinquent Tenant - County |
Last RefreshedDecember 25, 2020 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 22, 2006 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION RETD EXECUTED; VER: F; K
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
August 17, 2006 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO SHERIFF; VER: N; K
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
August 16, 2006 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION RECEIVED Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION RECEIVED W/CHECK; VER: N; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
August 14, 2006 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT Comment: FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION OR15306PG1184-001; VER: F; P Vol./Book 15306, Page 1184, 001 pages
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
August 14, 2006 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO) Comment: DEFAULT JUDGMENT; VER: N; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
August 11, 2006 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED Comment: DEFAULT ENTERED COUNT I; VER: N; K
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
August 10, 2006 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT Comment: MOTION FOR DEFAULT COUNT I; VER: F; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
August 10, 2006 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT Comment: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; VER: F; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
August 10, 2006 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT Comment: AFFIDAVIT IN PROOF OF CLAIM AND; VER: N; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
August 10, 2006 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE Comment: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; VER: F; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.