Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Asset Acceptance Llc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Michelle A White, against Haskins, Glenn E, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with JAGGER, EDWIN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 31, 2006 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF WRIT ON DEFT
Date: August 07, 2015CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT SALARY-WAGES RETD SERVED 073115
Date: August 05, 2015(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF GARNISHMENT
Date: October 02, 2015NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: June 30, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF GARNISHMENT
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
August 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF WRIT ON DEFT
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
August 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT SALARY-WAGES RETD SERVED 073115
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
July 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
CC CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT MAILED TO JJL
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
July 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT PALM HARDEN OF LARGO DBA SA-PG-LARGO LLC
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
June 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
June 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT PALM GARDEN OF LARGO DBA SA-PG - LARGO LLC - SENT TO JUDGE 7/14/15
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
October 30, 2006 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO) Comment: DEFAULT JUDGMENT; VER: N; P
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
October 30, 2006 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT Comment: DEFAULT JUDGMENT $760.68 PRIN $200.38 INT $182.00 COST; VER: F; P
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
October 30, 2006 | Docket Event |
RECORDED AT Comment: RECORDED AT: OR15452PG2540-001; VER: N; P Vol./Book 15452, Page 2540, 001 pages
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.