Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Patel, Babubhai K, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Kimberly J Gustafson, against Orion Funding Group Llc, represented by Thomas G Long, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with DEMERS, DAVID A presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 31, 2006 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 20, 2009 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING Comment: ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIP VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; VER: F; P
Judge: DEMERS, DAVID A |
|
November 20, 2009 | Docket Event |
WITH PREJUDICE Comment: WITH PREJUDICE; VER: F; P
Judge: DEMERS, DAVID A |
|
November 17, 2009 | Docket Event |
ATTORNEY COVER LETTER Comment: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER RECD BY COURT 111609; VER: F; P
Judge: DEMERS, DAVID A |
|
November 17, 2009 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL Comment: ORDER OF DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE OR16754PG2597-001; VER: F; P Vol./Book 16754, Page 2597, 001 pages
Judge: DEMERS, DAVID A |
|
November 17, 2009 | Docket Event |
JOINT STIPULATION Comment: JOINT STIPULATION DISMISSAL (COPY); VER: F; P
Judge: DEMERS, DAVID A |
|
November 17, 2009 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; P
Judge: DEMERS, DAVID A |
|
November 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
JOINT STIPULATION Comment: JOINT STIPULATION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE; VER: F; P
Judge: DEMERS, DAVID A |
|
February 09, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY Comment: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY; VER: F; P
Judge: DEMERS, DAVID A |
|
September 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
RECEIVED BY COURT Comment: APPROVED BY COURT RECEIVED BY COURT 091008; VER: F; P
Judge: DEMERS, DAVID A |
|
September 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE Comment: COPY NOTICE OF RECORD ACTIVITY/GOOD CAUSE FOR NO DISMISSAL; VER: F; P
Judge: DEMERS, DAVID A |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.