Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Williams, Lisa, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Williams, H Dennis, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with KHOUZAM, NELLY N presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 23, 2005 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 02, 2006 | Docket Event |
CERTIFIED STATEMENT COMPLETED BY CLERK Comment: CERTIFIED STATEMENT COMPLETED BY CLERK; VER: N; K
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
February 24, 2006 | Docket Event |
COPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE Comment: COPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE; VER: F; P
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
February 24, 2006 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
February 24, 2006 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT Comment: FINAL JUDGMENT OR14952PG0247-002; VER: F; P Vol./Book 14952, Page 0247, 002 pages
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
February 24, 2006 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT (SRS) Comment: JUDGMENT; VER: N; P
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
January 19, 2006 | Docket Event |
PETITIONER'S FINANCIAL STATEMENT-AFFIDAVIT Comment: FINANCIAL STATEMENT/AFFIDAVIT; VER: F; P
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
January 19, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING Comment: NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT; VER: F; P
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
January 13, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Comment: NOTICE OF HEARING 022406 AT 9:00 (UNCONTESTED FINAL); VER: F; P
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
January 11, 2006 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING Comment: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; VER: F; K
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
January 10, 2006 | Docket Event |
PETITIONER'S FINANCIAL STATEMENT-AFFIDAVIT Comment: FINANCIAL STATEMENT/AFFIDAVIT; VER: F; P
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.