Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Florida State Of Department Of Revenue, Andrews, Naomi Elizabeth, filed a(n) Paternity - Family case against Vallely, Robert John-Allen, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with KHOUZAM, NELLY N presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 23, 2005 |
CategoryIv-D Paternity |
Last RefreshedDecember 29, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypePaternity |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 01, 2007 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE Comment: NOTICE OF LIMITED APPEARANCE; VER: F; D
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
October 01, 2007 | Docket Event |
DEF-RESP'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME Comment: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS; VER: F; D
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
September 25, 2007 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING Comment: NOTICE OF FILING SUMMONS; VER: F; P
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
September 25, 2007 | Docket Event |
PLURIES SUMMONS - SERVED Comment: PLURIES SUMMONS RETD SERVED ROBERT JOHN-ALLEN VALLELY 091007; VER: F; K
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
August 30, 2007 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; P
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
August 30, 2007 | Docket Event |
FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE Comment: FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OR15961PG0176-001; VER: F; P Vol./Book 15961, Page 0176, 001 pages
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
August 30, 2007 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
August 21, 2007 | Docket Event |
Summons W/Copy Petition Attd To: Comment: PLURIES SUMMONS W/COPY PETITION ATTD TO: OAG; VER: N; K
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
August 15, 2007 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR PLURIES SUMMONS Comment: REQUEST FOR PLURIES SUMMONS; VER: F; P
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
June 29, 2007 | Docket Event |
ORDER Comment: ORDER EXTENDING TIME 60 DAYS; VER: F; P
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.