Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Paul, Gequita Marvette, Florida State Of Department Of Revenue, filed a(n) Paternity - Family case against Strickland, Michael Jalon, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with RONDOLINO, ANTHONY presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 23, 2005 |
CategoryIv-D Paternity |
Last RefreshedDecember 29, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypePaternity |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
ARREARS CALCULATION SHEET Doc # 2
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
August 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE CLERK REQUEST COLLECT ARREARS UPON EMANC Doc # 1
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
October 08, 2009 | Docket Event |
COPY CERTIFIED ARREARAGE AFFIDAVIT Comment: COPY CERTIFIED ARREARAGE AFFIDAVIT SENT TO DOR; VER: N; K
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
September 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR COPIES Comment: REQUEST FOR COPIES /SENT TO DOR 100809 TJL; VER: N; K
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
November 28, 2006 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT BY OPERATION OF LAW Comment: JUDGMENT BY OPERATION OF LAW; VER: F; K
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
November 03, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF OVERDUE SUPPORT PAYMENTS Comment: NOTICE OF OVERDUE SUPPORT PAYMENTS COPY; VER: F; K
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
August 15, 2006 | Docket Event |
CERTIFIED STATEMENT COMPLETED BY CLERK Comment: CERTIFIED STATEMENT COMPLETED BY CLERK; VER: N; K
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
August 11, 2006 | Docket Event |
ARREARS CALCULATION SHEET Comment: ARREARS CALCULATION SHEET; VER: F; K
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
August 11, 2006 | Docket Event |
Correspondence From Clerk Re Ovs Form Comment: CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE: OVS FORM; VER: N; K
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
August 10, 2006 | Docket Event |
CHILD SUPPORT GUIDELINES WORKSHEET Comment: CHILD SUPPORT GUIDELINES WORKSHEET; VER: F; P
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.