Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cope, Mary Kate, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Cope, Douglas Arthur, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with BULONE, JOSEPH A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBULONE, JOSEPH A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2006 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage |
Last RefreshedJanuary 14, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
REOPEN - CLOSED
Judge: BULONE, JOSEPH A |
|
June 12, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Comment: NOTICE OF HEARING 061208 @ 11; VER: F; P
Judge: BULONE, JOSEPH A |
|
June 12, 2008 | Docket Event |
CASE REOPENED Comment: REOPEN CASE/OTHER; VER: F; P
Judge: BULONE, JOSEPH A |
|
June 12, 2008 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION TO COMPEL Comment: MOTION TO COMPEL SUPPORT/; VER: F; P
Judge: BULONE, JOSEPH A |
|
June 12, 2008 | Docket Event |
ORDER Comment: ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL; VER: F; P
Judge: BULONE, JOSEPH A |
|
May 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
CASE REOPENED Comment: REOPEN CASE/OTHER; VER: N; P
Judge: BULONE, JOSEPH A |
|
May 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW Comment: MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL/; VER: F; P
Judge: BULONE, JOSEPH A |
|
May 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Comment: NOTICE OF HEARING 061208 @ 11; VER: F; P
Judge: BULONE, JOSEPH A |
|
April 03, 2008 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION TO COMPEL Comment: MOTION TO COMPEL CHILD SUPPORT; VER: F; P
Judge: BULONE, JOSEPH A |
|
February 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
FILE RETD TO CIV COURT RECORDS FROM APPEALS Comment: FILE RETD TO CIV COURT RECORDS FROM APPEALS; VER: N; K
Judge: BULONE, JOSEPH A |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.