Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Florida State Ofdepartment Of Revenue, Cannon, Stephen T, filed a(n) Paternity - Family case against Young, Jennifer A, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with ANDREWS, MICHAEL F presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 31, 2005 |
CategoryPaternity - Non Ivd |
Last RefreshedFebruary 05, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypePaternity |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE REDIRECT SUPPORT FROM DOR Doc # 4 DUPLICATE
Judge: ANDREWS, MICHAEL F |
|
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE REDIRECT SUPPORT FROM DOR Doc # 3
Judge: ANDREWS, MICHAEL F |
|
December 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
ARREARS CALCULATION SHEET Doc # 2
Judge: ANDREWS, MICHAEL F |
|
December 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE Doc # 1 CHANGE TO SUPPORT
Judge: ANDREWS, MICHAEL F |
|
June 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF DEFENDANT REJECTED
Judge: ANDREWS, MICHAEL F |
|
July 24, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF DEFENDANT Comment: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF DEFENDANT; VER: F; D
Judge: ANDREWS, MICHAEL F |
|
March 20, 2009 | Docket Event |
INTRO LETTER RE SUPPORT OBLIGATION Comment: INTRO LETTER RE: SUPPORT OBLIGATION TO RESP; VER: F; K
Judge: ANDREWS, MICHAEL F |
|
March 20, 2009 | Docket Event |
DEPOSITORY NOTICE REMOVING DOR FROM CASE Comment: DOR LOCATION CHANGED TO NORTH FROM NONE BY 4941; VER: N; P
Judge: ANDREWS, MICHAEL F |
|
March 20, 2009 | Docket Event |
ARREARS CALCULATION SHEET Comment: ARREARS CALCULATION SCREEN; VER: F; K
Judge: ANDREWS, MICHAEL F |
|
March 16, 2009 | Docket Event |
DEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEET Comment: DEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEET; VER: F; P
Judge: ANDREWS, MICHAEL F |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.