Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hall, Carlotta M, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Hall, Joseph M, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with RAMSBERGER, PETER presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRAMSBERGER, PETER Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 28, 2005 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage |
Last RefreshedDecember 26, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 29, 2007 | Docket Event |
CERTIFIED STATEMENT COMPLETED BY CLERK Comment: CERTIFIED STATEMENT COMPLETED BY CLERK; VER: N; K
Judge: RAMSBERGER, PETER |
|
January 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF OVERDUE SUPPORT PAYMENTS Comment: NOTICE OF OVERDUE SUPPORT PAYMENTS COPY; VER: F; K
Judge: RAMSBERGER, PETER |
|
January 25, 2007 | Docket Event |
ARREARS CALCULATION SHEET Comment: ARREARS CALCULATION SHEET; VER: F; K
Judge: RAMSBERGER, PETER |
|
January 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT (SRS) Comment: JUDGMENT; VER: N; P
Judge: RAMSBERGER, PETER |
|
January 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT Comment: FINAL JUDGMENT W/SUPPORT OR15603PG1435-002; VER: F; P Vol./Book 15603, Page 1435, 002 pages
Judge: RAMSBERGER, PETER |
|
January 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P
Judge: RAMSBERGER, PETER |
|
January 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Comment: NOTICE OF HEARING 012307 11:30; VER: F; P
Judge: RAMSBERGER, PETER |
|
November 09, 2006 | Docket Event |
ARREARS CALCULATION SHEET Comment: ARREARS CALCULATION SHEET; VER: F; K
Judge: RAMSBERGER, PETER |
|
November 06, 2006 | Docket Event |
COPY Comment: COPY MEDIATION AGREEMENT; VER: F; P
Judge: RAMSBERGER, PETER |
|
November 06, 2006 | Docket Event |
MEDIATION CONFERENCE REPORT Comment: FAMILY MEDIATION CHECKLIST; VER: F; P
Judge: RAMSBERGER, PETER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.