Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Riese, Ashley Marie, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Krassi, Hashim, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with ANDREWS, MICHAEL F presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeANDREWS, MICHAEL F Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 28, 2005 |
CategoryDomestic - Repeat Violence |
Last RefreshedDecember 27, 2020 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 05, 2005 | Docket Event |
COPY Comment: COPY ORDER OF DISMISSAL RETD BY PO; VER: F; P
Judge: ANDREWS, MICHAEL F |
|
November 23, 2005 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF INJUNCTION (SRS DISPO) Comment: ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF INJUNCTION OR14762PG1228-001; VER: F; P Vol./Book 14762, Page 1228, 001 pages
Judge: ANDREWS, MICHAEL F |
|
November 23, 2005 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; K
Judge: ANDREWS, MICHAEL F |
|
November 17, 2005 | Docket Event |
AMENDED Comment: AMENDED AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF ORDER SETTING HEARING; VER: F; P
Judge: ANDREWS, MICHAEL F |
|
November 15, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Comment: NOTICE OF HEARING 112205 @ 1:30; VER: F; P
Judge: ANDREWS, MICHAEL F |
|
November 15, 2005 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF CONTINUANCE Comment: ORDER OF CONTINUANCE /; VER: N; P
Judge: ANDREWS, MICHAEL F |
|
November 10, 2005 | Docket Event |
HEARING (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer ANDREWS, MICHAEL F)
Judge: ANDREWS, MICHAEL F |
|
November 03, 2005 | Docket Event |
CERTIFIED COPY Comment: CERTIFIED COPY ORDER SETTING HEARING RETD SERVED; VER: F; K
Judge: ANDREWS, MICHAEL F |
|
October 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
CASE CALENDARED FOR Comment: CASE CALENDARED FOR 111005 09:00; VER: N; P
Judge: ANDREWS, MICHAEL F |
|
October 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
PETITION (SRS) Comment: PETITION; VER: F; P
Judge: ANDREWS, MICHAEL F |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.