Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Reichle, Crysynda Crystle, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against William John Reichle Iii, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with KHOUZAM, NELLY N presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 25, 2005 |
CategoryDomestic Violence Injunction With Kids |
Last RefreshedFebruary 01, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 19, 2005 | Docket Event |
CERTIFIED COPY Comment: CERTIFIED COPY ORDER DISMISSING INJUNCITON TO SHF3; VER: N; K
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
December 19, 2005 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL Comment: ORDER OF DISMISSAL INJUNCTION OR14822PG0960-001; VER: F; P Vol./Book 14822, Page 0960, 001 pages
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
December 19, 2005 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; P
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
November 29, 2005 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF CONTINUANCE Comment: ORDER OF CONTINUANCE 121505 @ 2:30; VER: F; P
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
November 08, 2005 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF CONTINUANCE Comment: ORDER OF CONTINUANCE 112205 10:00; VER: F; P
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
November 03, 2005 | Docket Event |
HEARING (2:30 PM) (Judicial Officer KHOUZAM, NELLY N)
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
October 27, 2005 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT Comment: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF TEMPORARY INJUNCTION; VER: F; P
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
October 25, 2005 | Docket Event |
THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION Comment: THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION 023 BY 7353 - RANDOM FD; VER: N; P
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
October 25, 2005 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S INFORMATION SHEET Comment: CLERKS INFORMATION SHEET; VER: F; K
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
October 25, 2005 | Docket Event |
TEMPORARY INJUNCTION WITHOUT NOTICE Comment: TEMPORARY INJUNCTION W/O NOTICE 110305; VER: F; P
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.