Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Wilson, Sirena L, Florida State Of Department Of Revenue, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with RAMSBERGER, PETER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 25, 2005 |
CategoryIv-D Support |
Last RefreshedJanuary 05, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Comment: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; VER: F; P
Judge: RAMSBERGER, PETER |
|
May 31, 2006 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; K
Judge: RAMSBERGER, PETER |
|
May 31, 2006 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; K
Judge: RAMSBERGER, PETER |
|
May 31, 2006 | Docket Event |
MASTER ORDER OF DISMISSAL Comment: MASTER ORDER (03-009) DISMISSAL CALENDAR AS FOLLOW:; VER: N; K
Judge: RAMSBERGER, PETER |
|
May 31, 2006 | Docket Event |
MASTER ORDER OF DISMISSAL Comment: MARSHALL RUTHINETTE OR15153PG2087-002; VER: F; K Vol./Book 15153, Page 2087, 002 pages
Judge: RAMSBERGER, PETER |
|
April 10, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISM MAILED TO PLTF(S) Comment: NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISM MAILED TO PLTF(S) (S)/PLTF(S) ATTY(S); VER: N; K
Judge: RAMSBERGER, PETER |
|
April 10, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE INTENT DISM (LACK SERVICE) BY 000000 MAILE Comment: NOTICE INTENT DISM (LACK SERVICE) BY: 051006 MAILED AS TO:; VER: N; K
Judge: RAMSBERGER, PETER |
|
April 10, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE INTENT DISM (LACK SERVICE) BY 000000 MAILE Comment: MARSHALL RUTHINETTE; VER: N; K
Judge: RAMSBERGER, PETER |
|
January 23, 2006 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS - NOT SERVED Comment: SUMMONS RETD NOT SERVED RUTHINETTE MARSHALL; VER: F; K
Judge: RAMSBERGER, PETER |
|
October 25, 2005 | Docket Event |
DEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEET Comment: DEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEET; VER: F; P
Judge: RAMSBERGER, PETER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.