Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with Philip J. Federico presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 25, 2005 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 05, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 31, 2006 | Docket Event |
MASTER ORDER OF DISMISSAL Comment: MASTER ORDER (03-024) DISMISSAL CALENDAR AS FOLLOW:; VER: N; K
Judge: FEDERICO, PHILIP J |
|
May 31, 2006 | Docket Event |
MASTER ORDER OF DISMISSAL Comment: CHASE KATHLEEN OR15153PG2089-002; VER: F; K Vol./Book 15153, Page 2089, 002 pages
Judge: FEDERICO, PHILIP J |
|
May 31, 2006 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; K
Judge: FEDERICO, PHILIP J |
|
May 31, 2006 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; K
Judge: FEDERICO, PHILIP J |
|
April 10, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE INTENT DISM (LACK SERVICE) BY 000000 MAILE Comment: NOTICE INTENT DISM (LACK SERVICE) BY: 051006 MAILED AS TO:; VER: N; K
Judge: FEDERICO, PHILIP J |
|
April 10, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE INTENT DISM (LACK SERVICE) BY 000000 MAILE Comment: CHASE KATHLEEN; VER: N; K
Judge: FEDERICO, PHILIP J |
|
April 10, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISM MAILED TO PLTF(S) Comment: NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISM MAILED TO PLTF(S) (S)/PLTF(S) ATTY(S); VER: N; K
Judge: FEDERICO, PHILIP J |
|
January 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS - NOT SERVED Comment: SUMMONS RETD NOT SERVED KATHLEEN CHASE; VER: F; K
Judge: FEDERICO, PHILIP J |
|
November 15, 2005 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS - NOT SERVED Comment: SUMMONS RETD NOT SERVED KATHLEEN CHASE; VER: F; K
Judge: FEDERICO, PHILIP J |
|
October 25, 2005 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS MAILED TO ATTORNEY Comment: SUMMONS MAILED TO ATTORNEY; VER: N; K
Judge: FEDERICO, PHILIP J |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.