Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Mlg Management Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Lindsey M Porter, against Agree, Kenneth Scott, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with FULLERTON, WALTER presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFULLERTON, WALTER Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2005 |
CategoryDelinquent Tenant - County |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 26, 2006 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION RETD EXECUTED; VER: F; K
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
January 20, 2006 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO SHERIFF; VER: N; K
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
January 19, 2006 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT Comment: FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION OR14884PG1680-001; VER: F; P Vol./Book 14884, Page 1680, 001 pages
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
January 19, 2006 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO) Comment: DEFAULT JUDGMENT; VER: N; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
January 19, 2006 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
January 18, 2006 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED Comment: DEFAULT ENTERED COUNT I; VER: F; K
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
January 17, 2006 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE Comment: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; VER: F; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
January 17, 2006 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT Comment: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; VER: F; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
January 17, 2006 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT Comment: MOTION FOR DEFAULT / COUNT I; VER: F; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
January 17, 2006 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT Comment: AFFIDAVIT IN PROOF OF CLAIM AND; VER: N; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.