Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Palms Of Tarpon Springs Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Lindsey M Porter, against Kovach, William, Kovach, Kimberly, Kovach, Joseph, Kovach, Helen, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with ANDRINGA, HENRY J presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2005 |
CategoryDelinquent Tenant - County |
Last RefreshedFebruary 05, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 10, 2006 | Docket Event |
ORDER APPROVING STIP FOR PAYMENT Comment: ORDER APPROVING STIP FOR PAYMENT; VER: F; P
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
January 10, 2006 | Docket Event |
ATTORNEY COVER LETTER Comment: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER; VER: F; P
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
January 06, 2006 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION Comment: SETTLEMENT STIPULATION; VER: F; P
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
January 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS - SERVED Comment: SUMMONS RETD SERVED JOSEPH KOVACH 123005; VER: F; K
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
January 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS - SERVED Comment: SUMMONS RETD SERVED WILLIAM KOVACH 123005; VER: F; K
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
January 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS - SERVED Comment: SUMMONS RETD SERVED KIMBERLY KOVACH 123005; VER: F; K
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
December 29, 2005 | Docket Event |
County Civil Filing - Fee Paid $ Comment: COUNTY CIVIL FILING FEE PAID $80.00; VER: N; P
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
December 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
CASE FILED
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
December 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS TO PROCESS SERVER Comment: SUMMONS TO PROCESS SERVER; VER: N; K
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
December 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING Comment: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; VER: F; K
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.