Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
L And D Property Management, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by George G Pappas, Esq, against Perry, Melissa R, All Unknown Occupants, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with McNARY, MYRA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 31, 2005 |
CategoryDelinquent Tenant - County |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 23, 2005 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION RETD UNEXECUTED-WRIT RETD TO COURT; VER: F; K
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
November 22, 2005 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO SHERIFF; VER: N; K
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
November 22, 2005 | Docket Event |
COPY Comment: COPY OF WRIT OF POSSESSION; VER: F; K
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
November 21, 2005 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO) Comment: DEFAULT JUDGMENT; VER: N; P
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
November 21, 2005 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT Comment: FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION OR14757PG0277-001; VER: F; P Vol./Book 14757, Page 0277, 001 pages
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
November 21, 2005 | Docket Event |
ATTORNEY COVER LETTER Comment: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER; VER: F; P
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
November 16, 2005 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED Comment: DEFAULT ENTERED COUNT I BOTH DEFENDANTS; VER: F; K
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
November 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT Comment: MOTION FOR DEFAULT; VER: F; P
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
November 02, 2005 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS - SERVED Comment: SUMMONS RETD SERVED ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS 110105; VER: F; K
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
November 02, 2005 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS - SERVED Comment: SUMMONS RETD SERVED MELISSA R PERRY 110105; VER: F; K
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.