Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Nathan P Gryglewicz, Esq, against Talbott, Dorothy K, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHESSINGER, KATHLEEN T Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 31, 2005 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - County |
Last RefreshedJanuary 22, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
REOPEN - CLOSED
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
December 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
COPY Comment: COPY ORDER COMPELLING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES NOT SERVED; VER: F; K
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
July 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
ATTORNEY COVER LETTER Comment: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER; VER: F; P
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
July 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
ORDER Comment: ORDER COMPELLING ANSWERS TO INTERRGATORIES AND; VER: N; P
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
July 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
COMPLIANCE WITH Comment: COMPLIANCE WITH: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; VER: F; P
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
July 18, 2007 | Docket Event |
CASE REOPENED Comment: REOPEN CASE/OTHER; VER: N; P
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
July 18, 2007 | Docket Event |
Reopen Fee Paid $ Comment: RE-OPEN FEE PAID - $50.00; VER: N; P
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
July 18, 2007 | Docket Event |
EX-PARTE MOTION Comment: EX-PARTE MOTION: COMPEL POST-JUDGMENT DISCOVERY/SANCTIONS; VER: F; P
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
August 11, 2006 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM FOR DEPOSITION Comment: SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM FOR DEPO NOT SERVED; VER: F; P
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
July 07, 2006 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM FOR DEPOSITION Comment: SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM FOR DEPO NO SERVICE ATTACHED; VER: F; P
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.