Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Usa Court Village Lease Co Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by John E Mcmillan, Esq, against Rana, Kimberly Ann, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with VACCARO, DOROTHY presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 31, 2005 |
CategoryDelinquent Tenant - County |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 17, 2005 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUE TO ATTY MLD; VER: N; K
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
November 16, 2005 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT Comment: JUDGMENT FOR EVICTION OR14748PG1994-001; VER: F; P Vol./Book 14748, Page 1994, 001 pages
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
November 16, 2005 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO) Comment: DEFAULT JUDGMENT; VER: N; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
November 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED Comment: DEFAULT ENTERED COUNT I; VER: F; K
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
November 10, 2005 | Docket Event |
VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE Comment: VERIFIC. OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERV; VER: F; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
November 10, 2005 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT Comment: MOTION FOR DEFAULT COUNT I AND; VER: N; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
November 10, 2005 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT Comment: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION; VER: F; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
November 03, 2005 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS - SERVED Comment: SUMMONS RETD SERVED KIMBERLY ANN RANA 103105; VER: F; K
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
October 31, 2005 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS TO PROCESS SERVER - PICK UP Comment: SUMMONS TO PROCESS SERVER - PICK UP; VER: N; K
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
October 31, 2005 | Docket Event |
County Civil Filing - Fee Paid $ Comment: COUNTY CIVIL FILING FEE PAID $80.00; VER: N; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.