Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
United Dominion Realty Trust Inc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Brian P Wolk, Esq, against Smith, Alonzo, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with VACCARO, DOROTHY presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 31, 2005 |
CategoryDelinquent Tenant - County |
Last RefreshedJanuary 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 23, 2005 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION RETD UNEXECUTED-WRIT RETD TO COURT; VER: F; K
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
November 18, 2005 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUE TO SHF; VER: N; K
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
November 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT Comment: FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION OR14741PG2505-001; VER: F; P Vol./Book 14741, Page 2505, 001 pages
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
November 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO) Comment: DEFAULT JUDGMENT; VER: N; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
November 10, 2005 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED Comment: DEFAULT ENTERED COUNT I; VER: F; K
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
November 09, 2005 | Docket Event |
VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE Comment: VERIFIC. OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERV; VER: F; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
November 09, 2005 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT Comment: MOTION FOR DEFAULT; VER: F; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
November 03, 2005 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS SERVED - POSTED Comment: SUMMONS RETD SERVED/POSTED ALONZO SMITH 110105; VER: F; K
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
October 31, 2005 | Docket Event |
THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION Comment: THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION 042 BY 6058 - RANDOM CO; VER: N; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
October 31, 2005 | Docket Event |
County Civil Filing - Fee Paid $ Comment: COUNTY CIVIL FILING FEE PAID $80.00; VER: N; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.