Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Yaciw, Brent Michael, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Wilson, Bilan, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with FULLERTON, WALTER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 31, 2005 |
CategoryDelinquent Tenant - County |
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 13, 2005 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION RETD UNEXECUTED-WRIT RETD TO COURT; VER: F; K
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
December 08, 2005 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED MLD TO ATTY; VER: N; K
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
December 02, 2005 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO) Comment: DEFAULT JUDGMENT; VER: N; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
December 02, 2005 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT Comment: FINAL JUDGMENT OR14780PG0312-001; VER: F; P Vol./Book 14780, Page 0312, 001 pages
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
November 30, 2005 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT Comment: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-PAYMENT; VER: F; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
November 08, 2005 | Docket Event |
ORDER APPROVING STIP FOR PAYMENT Comment: ORDER APPROVING STIP FOR PAYMENT; VER: F; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
November 07, 2005 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION Comment: STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT; VER: F; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
November 01, 2005 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS SERVED - POSTED Comment: SUMMONS RETD SERVED/POSTED BILAN WILSON 103105; VER: F; K
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
October 31, 2005 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT - II COUNTS Comment: COMPLAINT AND COPY(S) - II COUNTS; VER: F; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
October 31, 2005 | Docket Event |
THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION Comment: THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION 039 BY 3762 - RANDOM CO; VER: N; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.